Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR733

Caption

Recognizing May 7, 2015, as Salad Day 2015.

Impact

The resolution outlines that there are currently 1,105 McDonald's restaurants operating in Texas, employing nearly 67,000 individuals. It emphasizes the significant local economic contributions made by these establishments, such as sourcing a vast amount of food products from local suppliers. This not only supports local agriculture but also fosters a greater sense of community and economic interdependence.

Summary

Senate Resolution No. 733 recognizes May 7, 2015, as Salad Day 2015 at the State Capitol in Texas. The resolution celebrates the contributions of McDonald’s owner-operators in the state, specifically highlighting their economic impact and community engagement. It notes that the event involves the serving of salads to the public and aims to raise awareness about the positive influence of the McDonald's system on local economies.

Contention

While the resolution itself does not present contention in a traditional legislative sense, it is reflective of broader discussions surrounding the role of fast-food restaurants in community health and economic development. As McDonald's promotes Salad Day, it showcases a commitment to healthier options, which addresses concerns over public health issues related to fast food consumption. However, perspectives on fast-food chains often include critiques related to nutrition, which may contrast with the celebration of such events.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

TX HR1743

Recognizing April 26, 2013, as McDonald's Salad Day.

TX HR1613

Recognizing May 14, 2019, as Salad Day at the State Capitol and commending the owners/operators of Texas McDonald's restaurants for their contributions to the state's economy.

TX HR980

Recognizing March 23, 2011, as Salad Day and commending the owner/operators of Texas McDonald's restaurants.

TX HR2455

Recognizing May 7, 2015, as Salad Day and commending the owners/operators of Texas McDonald's restaurants for their contributions to the state's economy.

LA HR216

Commends the McDonald's Restaurant on Plank Road in Baton Rouge upon the celebration of its fiftieth anniversary

TX SR69

Recognizing the National Black McDonald's Operators Association on the occasion of its national convention.

TX HR739

Recognizing April 21, 2021, as McDonald's Virtual Legislative Day.

TX SR615

Recognizing March 23, 2011, as Salad Day at the State Capitol.