House | 05/10/2013 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Record vote | RV#669 | Journal Page: 2768 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2768 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2756 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 841 | |
House | 03/14/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 699 | |
House | 02/19/2013 | Referred to House Administration | Journal Page: 436 | |
House | 01/29/2013 | Filed |