House | 03/13/2013 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 652 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 652 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 528 | |
House | 02/22/2013 | Filed |