Senate | 05/21/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1703 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1499 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1312 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1310 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 112 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 112 | |
Senate | 01/23/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 83 | |
Senate | 11/12/2012 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2012 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |