Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB101 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Patrick, Schwertner S.B. No. 101
22 (In the Senate - Filed November 12, 2012; January 29, 2013,
33 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
44 April 29, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
55 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 10, Nays 3;
66 April 29, 2013, sent to printer.)
77 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 101 By: Patrick
88
99
1010 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1111 AN ACT
1212 relating to the constitutional limit on the rate of growth of
1313 appropriations of revenue.
1414 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1515 SECTION 1. Sections 316.001 and 316.002, Government Code,
1616 are amended to read as follows:
1717 Sec. 316.001. LIMIT. (a) The rate of growth of
1818 appropriations in a state fiscal biennium from all sources of
1919 revenue other than the federal government [state tax revenues not
2020 dedicated by the constitution] may not exceed a rate determined by
2121 adding the estimated rate of the increase or decrease in the state's
2222 population during the next state fiscal biennium and the estimated
2323 rate of monetary inflation or deflation in this state during that
2424 next biennium [the estimated rate of growth of the state's
2525 economy].
2626 (b) If the sum of the estimated rates described by
2727 Subsection (a) is a negative number, the amount of appropriations
2828 authorized for the next state fiscal biennium from all sources of
2929 revenue other than the federal government must decrease as
3030 prescribed by this subchapter.
3131 Sec. 316.002. DUTIES OF LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD.
3232 (a) Before the Legislative Budget Board submits the budget for the
3333 next state fiscal biennium as prescribed by Section 322.008(c), the
3434 board shall establish:
3535 (1) the maximum allowable rate of growth of
3636 appropriations from all sources of revenue other than the federal
3737 government between the current state fiscal biennium and the next
3838 state fiscal biennium, in accordance with Section 22, Article VIII,
3939 Texas Constitution, expressed as a percentage, by adding the
4040 following estimated rates, as determined by the board:
4141 (A) the estimated rate of change of the state's
4242 population during the next state fiscal biennium, expressed as a
4343 percentage; and
4444 (B) the estimated rate of monetary inflation or
4545 deflation in this state during the next state fiscal [estimated
4646 rate of growth of the state's economy from the current biennium to
4747 the next] biennium, expressed as a percentage;
4848 (2) the estimated amount [level] of appropriations for
4949 the current state fiscal biennium from all sources of revenue other
5050 than the federal government [state tax revenues not dedicated by
5151 the constitution]; and
5252 (3) the amount of [state tax] revenues from all
5353 sources of revenue other than the federal government [not dedicated
5454 by the constitution] that could be appropriated for the next state
5555 fiscal biennium within the limit established in accordance with the
5656 maximum allowable rate of growth determined under Subdivision (1)
5757 and the estimated amount of appropriations for the current state
5858 fiscal biennium determined under Subdivision (2) [by the estimated
5959 rate of growth of the state's economy].
6060 (b) If the sum of the estimated rate of increase or decrease
6161 in the state's population and the estimated rate of monetary
6262 inflation or deflation in this state is a negative number, the
6363 amount of appropriations authorized for the next state fiscal
6464 biennium from all sources of revenue other than the federal
6565 government may not exceed the amount of appropriations from those
6666 sources of revenue in the current state fiscal biennium reduced by
6767 the product of that amount and the additive inverse of the sum of
6868 those rates. [Except as provided by Subsection (c), the board shall
6969 determine the estimated rate of growth of the state's economy by
7070 dividing the estimated Texas total personal income for the next
7171 biennium by the estimated Texas total personal income for the
7272 current biennium. Using standard statistical methods, the board
7373 shall make the estimate by projecting through the biennium the
7474 estimated Texas total personal income reported by the United States
7575 Department of Commerce or its successor in function.]
7676 (c) [If a more comprehensive definition of the rate of
7777 growth of the state's economy is developed and is approved by the
7878 committee established by Section 316.005, the board may use that
7979 definition in calculating the limit on appropriations.
8080 [(d)] To ensure compliance with Section 22, Article VIII,
8181 [Section 22, of the] Texas Constitution, the Legislative Budget
8282 Board may not transmit in any form to the governor or the
8383 legislature the budget as prescribed by Section 322.008(c) or the
8484 general appropriations bill as prescribed by Section 322.008(d)
8585 until the limit on the rate of growth of appropriations has been
8686 adopted as required by this subchapter.
8787 (d) [(e)] In the absence of an action by the Legislative
8888 Budget Board to adopt a spending limit as provided by this section
8989 [in Subsections (a) and (b)], the sum of the estimated rate of
9090 population growth and the estimated rate of inflation [in the
9191 state's economy from the current biennium to the next biennium]
9292 shall be treated as if that rate [it] were zero, and the amount of
9393 revenue from all sources of revenue other than the federal
9494 government [state tax revenues not dedicated by the constitution]
9595 that could be appropriated for the next state fiscal biennium is
9696 [within the limit established by the estimated rate of growth in the
9797 state's economy shall be] the same as the amount [level] of
9898 appropriations from those sources of revenue for the current
9999 biennium.
100100 SECTION 2. Section 316.006, Government Code, is amended to
101101 read as follows:
102102 Sec. 316.006. LIMIT ON BUDGET RECOMMENDATIONS. Unless
103103 authorized by majority vote of the members of the board from each
104104 house, the Legislative Budget Board budget recommendations
105105 relating to the proposed appropriations of revenue from all sources
106106 of revenue other than the federal government [state tax revenues
107107 not dedicated by the constitution] may not exceed the limit adopted
108108 by the committee under Section 316.005.
109109 SECTION 3. Subsection (a), Section 316.007, Government
110110 Code, is amended to read as follows:
111111 (a) The Legislative Budget Board shall include in its budget
112112 recommendations the proposed limit of appropriations of revenue
113113 from all sources of revenue other than the federal government [from
114114 state tax revenues not dedicated by the constitution].
115115 SECTION 4. Subsection (a), Section 316.008, Government
116116 Code, is amended to read as follows:
117117 (a) Unless the legislature adopts a resolution under
118118 Section 22, Article VIII, [Section 22(b), of the] Texas
119119 Constitution, raising the proposed limit on appropriations, the
120120 proposed limit is binding on the legislature with respect to all
121121 appropriations for the next state fiscal biennium made from all
122122 sources of revenue other than the federal government [state tax
123123 revenues not dedicated by the constitution].
124124 SECTION 5. The changes in law made by this Act apply only,
125125 as applicable, in relation to appropriations made for the state
126126 fiscal biennium beginning September 1, 2015, and subsequent state
127127 fiscal bienniums. Appropriations for the state fiscal biennium
128128 that begins September 1, 2013, are governed by Sections 316.001,
129129 316.002, and 316.008, Government Code, as those sections existed on
130130 January 1, 2013, and the former law is continued in effect for that
131131 purpose.
132132 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect on the date on which the
133133 constitutional amendment proposed by the 83rd Legislature, Regular
134134 Session, 2013, concerning the limitation on the rate of growth of
135135 appropriations of revenue takes effect. If that amendment is not
136136 approved by the voters, this Act has no effect.
137137 * * * * *