House | 05/16/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 3362 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3362 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1827 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1203 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1153 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1153 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1153 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1153 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1153 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1153 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Amended | Journal Page: 1153 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Carona | Journal Page: 1153 |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1152 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1152 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 911 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 798 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 424 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 424 | |
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |