Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1034 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Carona S.B. No. 1034
 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2013; March 12, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 15, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1; April 15, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1034 By:  Carona


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the unauthorized use of an alcoholic beverage permit or
 license; providing a criminal penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.05, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 11.05.  UNAUTHORIZED USE OF PERMIT. A [No] permittee
 may not consent to or allow the use or display of the permittee's
 [his] permit by a person other than the person to whom the permit
 was issued.
 SECTION 2.  Section 11.46, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  The commission or administrator shall refuse to issue an
 original permit to a person convicted of an offense under Section
 101.76 for a period of 10 years from the date of the conviction.
 SECTION 3.  Section 11.61, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d-1) to read as follows:
 (d-1)  Notwithstanding Section 11.64, the commission or
 administrator shall cancel an original or renewal permit if it is
 found, after notice and hearing, that the permittee was convicted
 of an offense under Section 101.76.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter A, Chapter 61, Alcoholic Beverage
 Code, is amended by adding Section 61.16 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.16.  UNAUTHORIZED USE OF LICENSE. A licensee may not
 consent to or allow the use or display of the licensee's license by
 a person other than the person to whom the license was issued.
 SECTION 5.  Section 61.42, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  The county judge, commission, or administrator shall
 refuse to approve or issue a license to a person convicted of an
 offense under Section 101.76 for a period of 10 years from the date
 of the conviction.
 SECTION 6.  Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Alcoholic Beverage
 Code, is amended by adding Section 61.713 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.713.  CANCELLATION FOR IMPROPER DISPLAY OR USE OF
 LICENSE.  Notwithstanding Section 61.76 or 61.761, the commission
 or administrator shall cancel an original or renewal license if it
 is found, after notice and hearing, that the licensee was convicted
 of an offense under Section 101.76.
 SECTION 7.  Subchapter D, Chapter 101, Alcoholic Beverage
 Code, is amended by adding Section 101.76 to read as follows:
 Sec. 101.76.  UNLAWFUL DISPLAY OR USE OF PERMIT OR LICENSE.
 (a) A person commits an offense if the person allows another person
 to display or use a permit or license issued by the commission in
 any manner not allowed by law.
 (b)  A person commits an offense if the person displays or
 uses a permit or license issued by the commission to another person
 in any manner not allowed by law.
 (c)  An offense under this section is a state jail felony.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *