Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1087 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Campbell S.B. No. 1087
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2013; March 12, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 29, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 April 29, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1087 By:  Garcia


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain municipalities to file a lien
 for the costs of abatement of a floodplain ordinance violation;
 providing a civil penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 54.012, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 54.012.  CIVIL ACTION. (a)  A municipality may bring a
 civil action for the enforcement of an ordinance:
 (1)  for the preservation of public safety, relating to
 the materials or methods used to construct a building or other
 structure or improvement, including the foundation, structural
 elements, electrical wiring or apparatus, plumbing and fixtures,
 entrances, or exits;
 (2)  relating to the preservation of public health or
 to the fire safety of a building or other structure or improvement,
 including provisions relating to materials, types of construction
 or design, interior configuration, illumination, warning devices,
 sprinklers or other fire suppression devices, availability of water
 supply for extinguishing fires, or location, design, or width of
 entrances or exits;
 (3)  for zoning that provides for the use of land or
 classifies a parcel of land according to the municipality's
 district classification scheme;
 (4)  establishing criteria for land subdivision or
 construction of buildings, including provisions relating to street
 width and design, lot size, building width or elevation, setback
 requirements, or utility service specifications or requirements;
 (5)  implementing civil penalties under this
 subchapter for conduct classified by statute as a Class C
 misdemeanor;
 (6)  relating to dangerously damaged or deteriorated
 structures or improvements;
 (7)  relating to conditions caused by accumulations of
 refuse, vegetation, or other matter that creates breeding and
 living places for insects and rodents;
 (8)  relating to the interior configuration, design,
 illumination, or visibility of business premises exhibiting for
 viewing by customers while on the premises live or mechanically or
 electronically displayed entertainment intended to provide sexual
 stimulation or sexual gratification; or
 (9)  relating to point source effluent limitations or
 the discharge of a pollutant, other than from a non-point source,
 into a sewer system, including a sanitary or storm water sewer
 system, owned or controlled by the municipality.
 (b)  A municipality that contains more than 75 percent of the
 population of a county with a population of 1.5 million or more may
 bring a civil action for the enforcement of an ordinance relating to
 floodplain control and administration, including an ordinance
 regulating the placement of a structure, fill, or other materials
 in a designated floodplain.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 54, Local Government Code,
 is amended by adding Section 54.020 to read as follows:
 Sec. 54.020.  ABATEMENT OF FLOODPLAIN VIOLATION IN CERTAIN
 MUNICIPALITIES; LIEN.  (a)  This section applies only to a
 municipality that contains more than 75 percent of the population
 of a county with a population of 1.5 million or more.
 (b)  In addition to any necessary and reasonable actions
 authorized by law, a municipality may abate a violation of a
 floodplain management ordinance by causing the work necessary to
 bring real property into compliance with the ordinance, including
 the repair, removal, or demolition of a structure, fill, or other
 material illegally placed in the area designated as a floodplain,
 if:
 (1)  the municipality gives the owner reasonable notice
 and opportunity to comply with the ordinance; and
 (2)  the owner of the property fails to comply with the
 ordinance.
 (c)  The municipality may assess the costs incurred by the
 municipality under Subsection (b) against the property. The
 municipality has a lien on the property for the costs incurred and
 for interest accruing at the annual rate of 10 percent on the amount
 due until the municipality is paid.
 (d)  The municipality may perfect the lien by filing written
 notice of the lien with the county clerk of the county in which the
 property is located.  The notice of lien must be in recordable form
 and must state the name of each property owner, if known, the legal
 description of the property, and the amount due.
 (e)  The municipality's lien is inferior to any previously
 recorded bona fide mortgage lien attached to the real property to
 which the municipality's lien attaches, if the mortgage lien was
 filed for record before the date the municipality files the notice
 of lien with the county clerk. The municipality's lien is superior
 to all other previously recorded judgment liens.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *