Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1147 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: West S.B. No. 1147
22 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2013; March 12, 2013, read
33 first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
44 April 2, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
55 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 2, 2013,
66 sent to printer.)
77 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1147 By: West
88
99
1010 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1111 AN ACT
1212 relating to the electronic filing system established by rule or
1313 order of the Texas Supreme Court; authorizing fees.
1414 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1515 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 72, Government Code, is
1616 amended by adding Section 72.031 to read as follows:
1717 Sec. 72.031. ELECTRONIC FILING SYSTEM. (a) In this
1818 section:
1919 (1) "Appellate court" means the supreme court, the
2020 court of criminal appeals, or a court of appeals.
2121 (2) "Electronic filing system" means the filing system
2222 established by supreme court rule or order for the electronic
2323 filing of documents in courts of this state.
2424 (3) "Electronic filing transaction" means the
2525 simultaneous electronic filing of one or more documents related to
2626 a proceeding before a court in this state.
2727 (4) "Local government" means a county or municipality.
2828 (b) The office as authorized by supreme court rule or order
2929 may implement an electronic filing system for use in the courts of
3030 this state and may set fees for transactions that use the electronic
3131 filing system. A fee set under this subsection for a transaction
3232 may not exceed $4.
3333 (c) A fee set by the office for using the electronic filing
3434 system is in addition to any other statutory fee. The revenue
3535 collected from the fees must be used to support the electronic
3636 filing system, including the recovery of system costs.
3737 (d) A local government or appellate court that uses the
3838 electronic filing system may charge a fee of $2 for each electronic
3939 filing transaction if:
4040 (1) the fee is necessary to recover the actual system
4141 operating costs reasonably incurred by the local government or
4242 appellate court to:
4343 (A) accept electronic payment methods; or
4444 (B) interface with other technology information
4545 systems;
4646 (2) the fee does not include an amount to recover local
4747 government or appellate court employee costs, other than costs for
4848 directly maintaining the system;
4949 (3) the governing body of the local government or the
5050 appellate court approves the fee using the local government or
5151 appellate court's standard approval process for fee increases; and
5252 (4) the local government or appellate court annually
5353 certifies to the office on a form prescribed by the office that the
5454 amount of the fee is necessary to recover the actual system
5555 operating costs incurred by the local government or appellate
5656 court.
5757 (d-1) This subsection and Subsection (d) expire September
5858 1, 2019.
5959 (e) A local government or appellate court that uses the
6060 electronic filing system may accept electronic payment methods,
6161 including payments made with credit and debit cards.
6262 (f) A governmental entity not otherwise required to pay a
6363 filing fee under any other law may not be required to pay a fee
6464 established under this section.
6565 (g) A court shall waive payment of any fee due under this
6666 section for an individual the court determines is indigent.
6767 SECTION 2. Subsection (a), Section 33.48, Tax Code, is
6868 amended to read as follows:
6969 (a) In addition to other costs authorized by law, a taxing
7070 unit is entitled to recover the following costs and expenses in a
7171 suit to collect a delinquent tax:
7272 (1) all usual court costs, including the cost of
7373 serving process and electronic filing fees;
7474 (2) costs of filing for record a notice of lis pendens
7575 against property;
7676 (3) expenses of foreclosure sale;
7777 (4) reasonable expenses that are incurred by the
7878 taxing unit in determining the name, identity, and location of
7979 necessary parties and in procuring necessary legal descriptions of
8080 the property on which a delinquent tax is due;
8181 (5) attorney's fees in the amount of 15 percent of the
8282 total amount of taxes, penalties, and interest due the unit; and
8383 (6) reasonable attorney ad litem fees approved by the
8484 court that are incurred in a suit in which the court orders the
8585 appointment of an attorney to represent the interests of a
8686 defendant served with process by means of citation by publication
8787 or posting.
8888 SECTION 3. Subsection (a), Section 33.49, Tax Code, is
8989 amended to read as follows:
9090 (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b), a taxing unit is
9191 not liable in a suit to collect taxes for court costs, including any
9292 fees for service of process and electronic filing fees, an attorney
9393 ad litem, arbitration, or mediation, and may not be required to post
9494 security for costs.
9595 SECTION 4. Section 231.202, Family Code, is amended to read
9696 as follows:
9797 Sec. 231.202. AUTHORIZED COSTS AND FEES IN TITLE IV-D
9898 CASES. In a Title IV-D case filed under this title, including a
9999 case filed under Chapter 159, the Title IV-D agency shall pay only
100100 the following costs and fees:
101101 (1) filing fees and fees for issuance and service of
102102 process as provided by Chapter 110 of this code and by Sections
103103 51.317(b)(1), (2), and (3) and (b-1), 51.318(b)(2), and 51.319(2),
104104 Government Code;
105105 (2) fees for transfer as provided by Chapter 110;
106106 (3) fees for the issuance and delivery of orders and
107107 writs of income withholding in the amounts provided by Chapter 110;
108108 (4) the fee for services provided by sheriffs and
109109 constables, including:
110110 (A) a fee authorized under Section 118.131, Local
111111 Government Code, for serving each item of process to each
112112 individual on whom service is required, including service by
113113 certified or registered mail; and
114114 (B) a fee authorized under Section 157.103(b) for
115115 serving a capias;
116116 (5) the fee for filing an administrative writ of
117117 withholding under Section 158.503(d);
118118 (6) the fee for issuance of a subpoena as provided by
119119 Section 51.318(b)(1), Government Code; and
120120 (7) a fee authorized [under a local rule] for the
121121 electronic filing of documents with a clerk.
122122 SECTION 5. Not later than December 1, 2018, the Office of
123123 Court Administration of the Texas Judicial System shall file a
124124 report with the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
125125 representatives, and the presiding officers of the standing
126126 committees of each house of the legislature with jurisdiction over
127127 the judiciary detailing the number of local governments and
128128 appellate courts collecting a fee under Subsection (d), Section
129129 72.031, Government Code, as added by this Act, and the necessity of
130130 the local governments and appellate courts to continue collecting
131131 the fee.
132132 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
133133 * * * * *