By: West S.B. No. 1147 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2013; March 12, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence; April 2, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 2, 2013, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1147 By: West A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the electronic filing system established by rule or order of the Texas Supreme Court; authorizing fees. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 72, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 72.031 to read as follows: Sec. 72.031. ELECTRONIC FILING SYSTEM. (a) In this section: (1) "Appellate court" means the supreme court, the court of criminal appeals, or a court of appeals. (2) "Electronic filing system" means the filing system established by supreme court rule or order for the electronic filing of documents in courts of this state. (3) "Electronic filing transaction" means the simultaneous electronic filing of one or more documents related to a proceeding before a court in this state. (4) "Local government" means a county or municipality. (b) The office as authorized by supreme court rule or order may implement an electronic filing system for use in the courts of this state and may set fees for transactions that use the electronic filing system. A fee set under this subsection for a transaction may not exceed $4. (c) A fee set by the office for using the electronic filing system is in addition to any other statutory fee. The revenue collected from the fees must be used to support the electronic filing system, including the recovery of system costs. (d) A local government or appellate court that uses the electronic filing system may charge a fee of $2 for each electronic filing transaction if: (1) the fee is necessary to recover the actual system operating costs reasonably incurred by the local government or appellate court to: (A) accept electronic payment methods; or (B) interface with other technology information systems; (2) the fee does not include an amount to recover local government or appellate court employee costs, other than costs for directly maintaining the system; (3) the governing body of the local government or the appellate court approves the fee using the local government or appellate court's standard approval process for fee increases; and (4) the local government or appellate court annually certifies to the office on a form prescribed by the office that the amount of the fee is necessary to recover the actual system operating costs incurred by the local government or appellate court. (d-1) This subsection and Subsection (d) expire September 1, 2019. (e) A local government or appellate court that uses the electronic filing system may accept electronic payment methods, including payments made with credit and debit cards. (f) A governmental entity not otherwise required to pay a filing fee under any other law may not be required to pay a fee established under this section. (g) A court shall waive payment of any fee due under this section for an individual the court determines is indigent. SECTION 2. Subsection (a), Section 33.48, Tax Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) In addition to other costs authorized by law, a taxing unit is entitled to recover the following costs and expenses in a suit to collect a delinquent tax: (1) all usual court costs, including the cost of serving process and electronic filing fees; (2) costs of filing for record a notice of lis pendens against property; (3) expenses of foreclosure sale; (4) reasonable expenses that are incurred by the taxing unit in determining the name, identity, and location of necessary parties and in procuring necessary legal descriptions of the property on which a delinquent tax is due; (5) attorney's fees in the amount of 15 percent of the total amount of taxes, penalties, and interest due the unit; and (6) reasonable attorney ad litem fees approved by the court that are incurred in a suit in which the court orders the appointment of an attorney to represent the interests of a defendant served with process by means of citation by publication or posting. SECTION 3. Subsection (a), Section 33.49, Tax Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b), a taxing unit is not liable in a suit to collect taxes for court costs, including any fees for service of process and electronic filing fees, an attorney ad litem, arbitration, or mediation, and may not be required to post security for costs. SECTION 4. Section 231.202, Family Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 231.202. AUTHORIZED COSTS AND FEES IN TITLE IV-D CASES. In a Title IV-D case filed under this title, including a case filed under Chapter 159, the Title IV-D agency shall pay only the following costs and fees: (1) filing fees and fees for issuance and service of process as provided by Chapter 110 of this code and by Sections 51.317(b)(1), (2), and (3) and (b-1), 51.318(b)(2), and 51.319(2), Government Code; (2) fees for transfer as provided by Chapter 110; (3) fees for the issuance and delivery of orders and writs of income withholding in the amounts provided by Chapter 110; (4) the fee for services provided by sheriffs and constables, including: (A) a fee authorized under Section 118.131, Local Government Code, for serving each item of process to each individual on whom service is required, including service by certified or registered mail; and (B) a fee authorized under Section 157.103(b) for serving a capias; (5) the fee for filing an administrative writ of withholding under Section 158.503(d); (6) the fee for issuance of a subpoena as provided by Section 51.318(b)(1), Government Code; and (7) a fee authorized [under a local rule] for the electronic filing of documents with a clerk. SECTION 5. Not later than December 1, 2018, the Office of Court Administration of the Texas Judicial System shall file a report with the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the presiding officers of the standing committees of each house of the legislature with jurisdiction over the judiciary detailing the number of local governments and appellate courts collecting a fee under Subsection (d), Section 72.031, Government Code, as added by this Act, and the necessity of the local governments and appellate courts to continue collecting the fee. SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. * * * * *