House
|
05/16/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3437
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#875
|
Journal Page: 3436
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Failed to pass to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3436
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Point of order sustained (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 3435
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-T. King
|
Journal Page: 3434
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3434
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Postponed
|
5/16/13 2:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 3424
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3424
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 1495
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1495
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1425
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 754
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 701
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 701
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 701
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 701
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 701
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 701
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 701
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 660
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 436
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 436
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|