House | 05/14/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2545 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2545 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2161 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1408 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1360 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1360 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1360 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1360 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1359 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1359 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Amended | Journal Page: 1359 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Watson | Journal Page: 1359 |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1359 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1359 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 437 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 437 | |
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |