Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1163 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Watson, Nichols S.B. No. 1163
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2013; March 12, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 10, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 10, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requirements for consolidating water and sewer
 utilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (b), Section 13.145, Water Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *