House | 05/13/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2545 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2545 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2199 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1434 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1376 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1376 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1376 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1376 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1376 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1376 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1376 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1118 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 974 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Government Organization | Journal Page: 441 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 441 | |
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |