Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1207 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Van de Putte S.B. No. 1207
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2013; March 12, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Government Organization;
 April 22, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 22, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1207 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to parking and the movement of vehicles in the Capitol
 complex.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 411.063, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1) and (c-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (a-1), the department
 [The State Preservation Board] shall adopt rules for the safe
 movement and the parking of vehicles in the Capitol Complex. Except
 as provided by Subsection (a-1), the [The] department shall
 administer and enforce [the rules adopted by the preservation board
 and shall administer and enforce] this subchapter[. This
 subsection does not affect the authority of the department to adopt
 rules under Section 411.067].
 (a-1)  The State Preservation Board shall adopt rules for the
 safe movement and the parking of vehicles in parking areas under the
 charge and control of the preservation board.  The department may
 administer and enforce the rules adopted by the preservation board
 under this subsection at the request of the preservation board.
 This subsection does not affect the authority of the department to
 adopt rules under Section 411.067.
 (c-1)  Rules adopted under Subsection (a) must include a
 provision that allows a state employee who works outside the
 Capitol complex, as defined by Section 443.0071(b), and whose
 presence at the Capitol is requested by a member of the legislature
 or an elected official in the executive branch of state government
 to park free of charge in a parking garage or parking lot in the
 Capitol complex.  This subsection does not apply to the parking
 garage for visitors to the Capitol complex under Section
 443.0151(a) or to a parking area under the charge and control of the
 State Preservation Board.
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (a), Section 411.065, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A person commits an offense if the person violates a
 rule of the department adopted under Section 411.062 or a rule of
 the department or the State Preservation Board adopted under
 Section 411.063.
 SECTION 3.  Section 2165.2035, Government Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (g-1) to read as follows:
 (g-1)  Any lease of a state-owned parking lot or garage in
 the Capitol complex, as defined by Section 443.0071(b), under this
 section must provide that a state employee whose presence at the
 Capitol is requested by a member of the legislature or an elected
 official in the executive branch of state government may park free
 of charge in the lot or garage.  This subsection does not apply to
 the parking garage for visitors to the Capitol complex under
 Section 443.0151(a).
 SECTION 4.  (a)  On the effective date of this Act, rules of
 the State Preservation Board adopted under Section 411.063,
 Government Code, are transferred to the Department of Public Safety
 of the State of Texas and are continued in effect until amended or
 repealed by the Department of Public Safety.  Rules of the State
 Preservation Board adopted under Section 411.063, Government Code,
 relating to parking areas under the charge and control of the
 preservation board are continued in effect as rules of the
 preservation board.  As a result of the application of this
 subsection, a rule may exist as a duplicate rule of the State
 Preservation Board and the Department of Public Safety of the State
 of Texas applicable to different areas on and after the effective
 date of this Act.
 (b)  The Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas
 shall adopt or amend rules, as applicable, as required by
 Subsection (c-1), Section 411.063, Government Code, as added by
 this Act, not later than October 1, 2013.
 (c)  Subsection (g-1), Section 2165.2035, Government Code,
 as added by this Act, applies only to a lease entered into on or
 after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 5.  The change in law made by this Act to Section
 411.065, Government Code, applies only to an offense committed on
 or after the effective date of this Act. An offense committed
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the offense was committed, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of this section,
 an offense was committed before the effective date of this Act if
 any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *