Senate | 05/03/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1312 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1255 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Referred to Government Organization | Journal Page: 1200 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 1200 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security | Journal Page: 441 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 441 | |
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |