1 | 1 | | By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1208 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2013; March 12, 2013, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Rural Affairs, |
---|
4 | 4 | | and Homeland Security; April 24, 2013, rereferred to Committee on |
---|
5 | 5 | | Government Organization; April 29, 2013, reported adversely, with |
---|
6 | 6 | | favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, |
---|
7 | 7 | | Nays 0; April 29, 2013, sent to printer.) |
---|
8 | 8 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1208 By: Rodriguez |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | |
---|
11 | 11 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
12 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
13 | 13 | | relating to the creation of a regional food economy and food access |
---|
14 | 14 | | task force. |
---|
15 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 16 | | SECTION 1. REGIONAL FOOD ECONOMY AND FOOD ACCESS TASK |
---|
17 | 17 | | FORCE. (a) The regional food economy and food access task force is |
---|
18 | 18 | | created to study and provide recommendations to the legislature on |
---|
19 | 19 | | developing this state's regional food economy and improving access |
---|
20 | 20 | | to healthy food for the people in this state. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (b) The task force consists of nine members appointed as |
---|
22 | 22 | | follows: |
---|
23 | 23 | | (1) one member who is a representative of the food |
---|
24 | 24 | | retail industry with experience in grocery stores, appointed by the |
---|
25 | 25 | | governor; |
---|
26 | 26 | | (2) one member who is a physician with experience in |
---|
27 | 27 | | public health, appointed by the commissioner of state health |
---|
28 | 28 | | services; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (3) one member who is a representative of a community |
---|
30 | 30 | | development financial institution, appointed by the governor; |
---|
31 | 31 | | (4) one member who is a large-scale farmer, as defined |
---|
32 | 32 | | by the United States Department of Agriculture, appointed by the |
---|
33 | 33 | | lieutenant governor; |
---|
34 | 34 | | (5) one member who is a small-scale farmer, as defined |
---|
35 | 35 | | by the United States Department of Agriculture, with experience in |
---|
36 | 36 | | farmers markets, appointed by the lieutenant governor; |
---|
37 | 37 | | (6) one member who is a representative of a food bank, |
---|
38 | 38 | | appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives; |
---|
39 | 39 | | (7) one member who is a representative of a regional |
---|
40 | 40 | | food advocacy group, appointed by the speaker of the house of |
---|
41 | 41 | | representatives; |
---|
42 | 42 | | (8) one representative of the Texas Department of |
---|
43 | 43 | | Agriculture, appointed by the commissioner of agriculture; and |
---|
44 | 44 | | (9) one representative of the Texas A&M AgriLife |
---|
45 | 45 | | Extension Service, appointed by the chancellor of The Texas A&M |
---|
46 | 46 | | University System. |
---|
47 | 47 | | (c) The representative of the Texas A&M AgriLife Extension |
---|
48 | 48 | | Service serves as the presiding officer of the task force. |
---|
49 | 49 | | (d) A task force member is not entitled to compensation or |
---|
50 | 50 | | reimbursement of expenses. |
---|
51 | 51 | | (e) The task force shall: |
---|
52 | 52 | | (1) examine the following food economy goals: |
---|
53 | 53 | | (A) creating and retaining family-wage jobs; |
---|
54 | 54 | | (B) expanding export and local markets for |
---|
55 | 55 | | regional products; |
---|
56 | 56 | | (C) developing regional public-private |
---|
57 | 57 | | partnerships and leveraging existing public-private partnership |
---|
58 | 58 | | efforts; and |
---|
59 | 59 | | (D) improving access to healthy food and food |
---|
60 | 60 | | security, protecting natural resources, and enhancing community |
---|
61 | 61 | | connections; and |
---|
62 | 62 | | (2) develop recommendations for legislation and state |
---|
63 | 63 | | agency programming that will improve this state's regional food |
---|
64 | 64 | | economy and improve access to healthy food for the people in this |
---|
65 | 65 | | state. |
---|
66 | 66 | | (f) The task force shall meet not later than the 30th day |
---|
67 | 67 | | after the date the last initial appointment is made. The task force |
---|
68 | 68 | | shall meet regularly as necessary at the call of the presiding |
---|
69 | 69 | | officer. |
---|
70 | 70 | | (g) Not later than September 1, 2014, the task force shall: |
---|
71 | 71 | | (1) submit to the legislature a report outlining |
---|
72 | 72 | | legislative recommendations and recommendations for state agency |
---|
73 | 73 | | programming; and |
---|
74 | 74 | | (2) provide a presentation on the task force's |
---|
75 | 75 | | recommendations to the standing committee of each house of the |
---|
76 | 76 | | legislature with primary jurisdiction over economic development. |
---|
77 | 77 | | SECTION 2. EXPIRATION. The task force established under |
---|
78 | 78 | | this Act is abolished and this Act expires September 1, 2015. |
---|
79 | 79 | | SECTION 3. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect |
---|
80 | 80 | | immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members |
---|
81 | 81 | | elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas |
---|
82 | 82 | | Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for |
---|
83 | 83 | | immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
84 | 84 | | * * * * * |
---|