Senate | 04/22/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 798 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 478 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 478 | |
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |