Senate | 04/16/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 732 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 481 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 481 | |
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |