Senate | 04/30/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1258 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 482 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 482 | |
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |