Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1328 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Paxton S.B. No. 1328
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2013; March 13, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 March 27, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; March 27, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a statutory probate court in Collin
 County to hear and determine certain matters pending in a district
 or statutory county court.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 25.0453, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  Notwithstanding Section 74.094, a statutory probate
 court judge may hear and determine a matter pending in any district
 or statutory county court in Collin County regardless of whether
 the matter is preliminary or final or whether there is a judgment in
 the matter. The judge may sign a judgment or order in any of the
 courts regardless of whether the case is transferred. The
 judgment, order, or action is valid and binding as if the case were
 pending in the court of the judge who acts in the matter. The
 authority of this subsection applies to an active judge or a former
 or retired judge assigned to a statutory probate court.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *