House
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3673
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 2545
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2545
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1652
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1073
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 958
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 958
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 958
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 958
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Motion withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 918
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Motion to suspend three day rule
|
|
Journal Page: 918
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 917
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 917
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 917
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 917
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 780
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 484
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 484
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|