House
|
05/16/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3521
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2545
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2545
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1828
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1203
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1127
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1127
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1127
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1127
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 935
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 935
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 934
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Carona
|
Journal Page: 934
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 934
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 934
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 884
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 501
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 501
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|