E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/26/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3834
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5381
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3068
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2404
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3928
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1007
|
Journal Page: 3928
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3928
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3928
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3831
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3831
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3831
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3673
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3351
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2551
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2021
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1734
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1734
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1581
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 942
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 903
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 903
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 903
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 903
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 903
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 903
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 903
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 909
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 882
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 799
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 502
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 502
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|