E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/26/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3834
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5381
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3068
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2807
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4207
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1087
|
Journal Page: 4206
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4206
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4206
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4052
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4052
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4052
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3627
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3588
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3588
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3242
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2021
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 1419
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1419
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 746
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 464
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 464
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 464
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 464
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 464
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 464
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 464
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 235
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 116
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 116
|
Senate
|
12/11/2012
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/11/2012
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|