Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1429 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1429
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2013; March 18, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 4, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; April 4, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1429 By:  Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the exemption of the Corpus Christi Aquifer Storage and
 Recovery Conservation District from certain provisions concerning
 the desired future conditions of an aquifer.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 8811.005, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 8811.005.  APPLICABILITY OF OTHER LAW. (a)  Except as
 otherwise provided by this chapter, Chapter 36, Water Code, applies
 to the district.
 (b)  The following provisions of Chapter 36, Water Code, do
 not apply to the district:
 (1)  Sections 36.063(b) and (c);
 (2)  Sections 36.1071(a)(8) and (e)(3)(A);
 (3)  Sections 36.108(c)(4), (d), (d-1), (d-2), (d-3),
 and (d-4);
 (4)  Section 36.1083;
 (5)  Section 36.1084;
 (6)  Section 36.1085; and
 (7)  Section 36.1132.
 (c)  An affected person may not file a petition with the
 Texas Commission on Environmental Quality under Section 36.1082,
 Water Code, requesting an inquiry in connection with the district
 for a reason provided by Subsection (b)(4), (5), (6), or (7) of that
 section.
 (d)  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality may not
 take action against the district under Section 36.3011, Water Code,
 based on a finding under Subdivision (4), (5), (6), or (7) of that
 section.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a petition filed under Section 36.1082 or 36.1083, Water Code, on
 or after the effective date of this Act. A petition filed before
 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect when
 the petition was filed, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *