Senate | 05/17/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1424 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1424 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Amended | Journal Page: 1423 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Rodrguez | Journal Page: 1423 |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1423 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1422 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1371 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 509 | |
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 509 | |
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |