Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1478 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Rodriguez S.B. No. 1478
 (In the Senate - Filed February 11, 2013; March 18, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 May 1, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 1, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1478 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the satisfaction of annual renewable energy
 requirements by certain utilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.904, Utilities Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows:
 (c-1)  Notwithstanding any other law, the commission by rule
 shall require an investor-owned electric utility that was not
 affiliated with ERCOT and was operating solely outside of ERCOT in
 areas of this state that were included in the Western Electricity
 Coordinating Council on January 1, 2013, to satisfy, not later than
 December 31, 2015, at least 15 percent of the annual renewable
 energy requirement under Subsection (c) through capacity or
 purchases of renewable energy credits that are physically metered
 and verified in the utility's Texas or New Mexico service area.  The
 electric utility must satisfy at least 20 percent of that energy
 requirement in that manner by December 31, 2018, and at least 35
 percent by December 31, 2021. These requirements are subject to the
 following conditions:
 (1)  the electric utility may not be required to
 satisfy more than the specified percentages through capacity or
 purchases of renewable energy credits that are physically metered
 and verified in the utility's Texas or New Mexico service area;
 (2)  the maximum amount per renewable energy credit
 that the electric utility is required to incur in satisfaction of
 this subsection is the lesser of $50 or five times the average
 amount the electric utility paid for the purchase of a renewable
 energy credit for compliance in the previous year, and to the extent
 renewable energy credits cannot be obtained for that price, the
 electric utility is relieved of any further obligations under this
 subsection for that year; and
 (3)  the commission shall count toward the satisfaction
 of the obligations of this section any capacity or purchases of
 renewable energy credits that:
 (A)  are physically metered and verified in the
 utility's New Mexico service area; and
 (B)  are registered with a renewable energy
 generation information system that is designed to create and track
 ownership of renewable energy credits and that, through the use of
 independently audited generation data, verifies the generation and
 delivery of electricity associated with each renewable energy
 credit and protects against counting the same renewable energy
 credit more than once.
 SECTION 2.  The Public Utility Commission of Texas shall
 adopt rules to implement Subsection (c-1), Section 39.904,
 Utilities Code, as added by this Act, as soon as practicable
 following the effective date of this Act, but not later than August
 31, 2014.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2014.
 * * * * *