By: Rodriguez S.B. No. 1478 (In the Senate - Filed February 11, 2013; March 18, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce; May 1, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 1, 2013, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1478 By: Watson A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the satisfaction of annual renewable energy requirements by certain utilities. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 39.904, Utilities Code, is amended by adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows: (c-1) Notwithstanding any other law, the commission by rule shall require an investor-owned electric utility that was not affiliated with ERCOT and was operating solely outside of ERCOT in areas of this state that were included in the Western Electricity Coordinating Council on January 1, 2013, to satisfy, not later than December 31, 2015, at least 15 percent of the annual renewable energy requirement under Subsection (c) through capacity or purchases of renewable energy credits that are physically metered and verified in the utility's Texas or New Mexico service area. The electric utility must satisfy at least 20 percent of that energy requirement in that manner by December 31, 2018, and at least 35 percent by December 31, 2021. These requirements are subject to the following conditions: (1) the electric utility may not be required to satisfy more than the specified percentages through capacity or purchases of renewable energy credits that are physically metered and verified in the utility's Texas or New Mexico service area; (2) the maximum amount per renewable energy credit that the electric utility is required to incur in satisfaction of this subsection is the lesser of $50 or five times the average amount the electric utility paid for the purchase of a renewable energy credit for compliance in the previous year, and to the extent renewable energy credits cannot be obtained for that price, the electric utility is relieved of any further obligations under this subsection for that year; and (3) the commission shall count toward the satisfaction of the obligations of this section any capacity or purchases of renewable energy credits that: (A) are physically metered and verified in the utility's New Mexico service area; and (B) are registered with a renewable energy generation information system that is designed to create and track ownership of renewable energy credits and that, through the use of independently audited generation data, verifies the generation and delivery of electricity associated with each renewable energy credit and protects against counting the same renewable energy credit more than once. SECTION 2. The Public Utility Commission of Texas shall adopt rules to implement Subsection (c-1), Section 39.904, Utilities Code, as added by this Act, as soon as practicable following the effective date of this Act, but not later than August 31, 2014. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect January 1, 2014. * * * * *