E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3869 | |
E | 05/25/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3737 | |
House | 05/25/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4914 | |
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3280 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2910 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2054 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3596 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Record vote | RV#924 | Journal Page: 3601 |
House | 05/17/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3601 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3601 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3585 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3585 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3090 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 2546 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2546 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2199 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1434 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 912 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 510 | |
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 510 | |
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |