Senate | 05/13/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 975 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 511 | |
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 511 | |
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |