House | 05/01/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2163 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1561 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1561 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1496 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 773 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 773 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 773 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 773 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 773 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Amendment withdrawn | Journal Page: 773 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Garcia | Journal Page: 772 |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 772 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 772 | |
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 533 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 533 | |
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |