E | 05/24/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/24/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3396 | |
E | 05/13/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1765 | |
House | 05/13/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3190 | |
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1759 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1679 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Record vote | RV#671 | Journal Page: 2769 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2769 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2769 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2626 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2625 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | CSHB 3808 | Journal Page: 2625 |
House | 05/07/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2844 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 1561 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1561 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1496 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 762 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 762 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 762 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 762 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 762 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 762 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 762 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 779 | |
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 695 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 534 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 534 | |
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |