E | 06/14/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3869 | |
E | 05/20/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2258 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3691 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2025 | |
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2036 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 3520 | |
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1900 | |
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 1900 | |
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Read | Journal Page: 1900 | |
Senate | 05/16/2013 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1899 | |
Senate | 05/13/2013 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 1733 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3039 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Record vote | RV#761 | Journal Page: 3039 |
House | 05/10/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3039 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3039 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3025 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3025 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2367 | Journal Page: 3025 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3019 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 1626 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1626 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1628 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 976 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 931 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 931 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 931 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 931 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 931 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 931 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 931 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 534 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 534 | |
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |