House | 05/15/2013 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3099 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2840 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2840 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2199 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1434 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1119 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 537 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 537 | |
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |