1 | 1 | | By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1576 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2013; March 19, 2013, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services; |
---|
4 | 4 | | April 22, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | 5 | | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 22, 2013, |
---|
6 | 6 | | sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1576 By: Zaffirini |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to a study and report of issues affecting persons with |
---|
13 | 13 | | disabilities at state agencies and postsecondary educational |
---|
14 | 14 | | institutions. |
---|
15 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 115, Human Resources Code, is amended by |
---|
17 | 17 | | adding Section 115.0095 to read as follows: |
---|
18 | 18 | | Sec. 115.0095. STUDY REGARDING ACCESSIBILITY OF STATE |
---|
19 | 19 | | AGENCY AND HIGHER EDUCATION RESOURCES AND INFORMATION. (a) In |
---|
20 | 20 | | this section, "postsecondary educational institution" means an |
---|
21 | 21 | | institution of higher education or a private or independent |
---|
22 | 22 | | institution of higher education, as those terms are defined by |
---|
23 | 23 | | Section 61.003, Education Code. |
---|
24 | 24 | | (b) The committee, in collaboration with the Texas Higher |
---|
25 | 25 | | Education Coordinating Board and the Department of Information |
---|
26 | 26 | | Resources, shall conduct a study to identify difficulties persons |
---|
27 | 27 | | with disabilities are encountering at state agencies and |
---|
28 | 28 | | postsecondary educational institutions that receive state or |
---|
29 | 29 | | federal funds. |
---|
30 | 30 | | (c) The study must include an evaluation of the |
---|
31 | 31 | | accessibility of resources and information, whether printed or |
---|
32 | 32 | | electronic, including: |
---|
33 | 33 | | (1) materials provided by a state agency or |
---|
34 | 34 | | postsecondary educational institution; and |
---|
35 | 35 | | (2) with regard to a postsecondary educational |
---|
36 | 36 | | institution, learning and content management software used by the |
---|
37 | 37 | | institution and information and resources provided by student |
---|
38 | 38 | | organizations of the institution. |
---|
39 | 39 | | (d) The committee shall include the results of the study and |
---|
40 | 40 | | any recommendations for legislative or administrative action in the |
---|
41 | 41 | | report submitted to the governor and the legislature under Section |
---|
42 | 42 | | 115.009(3) before December 31, 2014. |
---|
43 | 43 | | (e) This section expires September 1, 2015. |
---|
44 | 44 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
45 | 45 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
46 | 46 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
47 | 47 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
48 | 48 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
49 | 49 | | * * * * * |
---|