House | 05/15/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1495 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1495 | |
House | 04/04/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1425 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 754 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 701 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 701 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 701 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 701 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 701 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 701 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 701 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 660 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 649 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 620 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 442 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 442 | |
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |