1 | 1 | | By: Fraser, Watson S.B. No. 1631 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2013; March 20, 2013, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources; |
---|
4 | 4 | | April 15, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8, |
---|
5 | 5 | | Nays 3; April 15, 2013, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to water management planning by the Lower Colorado River |
---|
11 | 11 | | Authority. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 8503, Special District Local Laws Code, |
---|
14 | 14 | | is amended by adding Sections 8503.032 and 8503.033 to read as |
---|
15 | 15 | | follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | Sec. 8503.032. WATER MANAGEMENT PLAN. (a) In this section |
---|
17 | 17 | | and Section 8503.033: |
---|
18 | 18 | | (1) "Firm water" means a supply of water for customers |
---|
19 | 19 | | of the authority that must be supplied 100 percent of the time |
---|
20 | 20 | | without shortage through a repeat of the drought of record. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (2) "Interruptible water" means a supply of water for |
---|
22 | 22 | | customers of the authority that does not have to be met 100 percent |
---|
23 | 23 | | of the time and must be interrupted or curtailed as provided by |
---|
24 | 24 | | Subsections (b) and (c). |
---|
25 | 25 | | (b) The authority shall interrupt or curtail the supply of |
---|
26 | 26 | | water under the authority's certificates of adjudication 14-5478 |
---|
27 | 27 | | and 14-5482, as amended, pursuant to commitments that are |
---|
28 | 28 | | specifically subject to interruption or curtailment, to the extent |
---|
29 | 29 | | necessary to allow the authority to satisfy all demands for water |
---|
30 | 30 | | under such permits pursuant to all firm, uninterruptible |
---|
31 | 31 | | commitments. |
---|
32 | 32 | | (c) Supply of interruptible water must be cut off entirely |
---|
33 | 33 | | before the authority curtails supplies of firm water or requests |
---|
34 | 34 | | that firm water customers institute voluntary drought contingency |
---|
35 | 35 | | measures. |
---|
36 | 36 | | (d) The authority's water management plan must: |
---|
37 | 37 | | (1) ensure that firm water supplies are available to |
---|
38 | 38 | | meet all existing and projected demands of firm water customers to |
---|
39 | 39 | | the extent provided by: |
---|
40 | 40 | | (A) the April 20, 1988, Final Judgment and Decree |
---|
41 | 41 | | adjudicating water rights in the Lower Colorado River Basin ("1988 |
---|
42 | 42 | | Final Judgment and Decree"); |
---|
43 | 43 | | (B) any orders issued by the commission or |
---|
44 | 44 | | predecessor agencies subsequent to the 1988 Final Judgment and |
---|
45 | 45 | | Decree approving the authority's water management plan for the |
---|
46 | 46 | | operation of Lakes Travis and Buchanan; |
---|
47 | 47 | | (C) water rights adjudicated by the 1988 Final |
---|
48 | 48 | | Judgment and Decree, and issued by the commission, as amended; and |
---|
49 | 49 | | (D) the provisions of the Water Code, rules of |
---|
50 | 50 | | the commission, or other law; and |
---|
51 | 51 | | (2) cease all water releases of interruptible water |
---|
52 | 52 | | when the combined storage of Lakes Travis and Buchanan is at or |
---|
53 | 53 | | below 850,000 acre-feet. |
---|
54 | 54 | | Sec. 8503.033. FIRM WATER PROTECTION. Section 8503.032 |
---|
55 | 55 | | does not, and the legislature does not intend to, diminish, |
---|
56 | 56 | | decrease, limit, impair, or modify, in any manner that is |
---|
57 | 57 | | detrimental to firm water customers, the authority's commitments or |
---|
58 | 58 | | contractual obligations to firm water customers or firm water |
---|
59 | 59 | | customers' rights, entitlements, protections, prioritization, or |
---|
60 | 60 | | status as either are set forth in: |
---|
61 | 61 | | (1) the April 20, 1988, Final Judgment and Decree |
---|
62 | 62 | | adjudicating water rights in the Lower Colorado River Basin ("1988 |
---|
63 | 63 | | Final Judgment and Decree"); |
---|
64 | 64 | | (2) any orders issued by the commission or predecessor |
---|
65 | 65 | | agencies subsequent to the 1988 Final Judgment and Decree approving |
---|
66 | 66 | | the authority's water management plan for operation of Lakes Travis |
---|
67 | 67 | | and Buchanan; |
---|
68 | 68 | | (3) any water management plan of the authority |
---|
69 | 69 | | approved by the commission; |
---|
70 | 70 | | (4) any permits or certificates of adjudication or |
---|
71 | 71 | | amendments of these issued by the commission subsequent to the 1988 |
---|
72 | 72 | | Final Judgment and Decree; |
---|
73 | 73 | | (5) any existing water supply agreements or other |
---|
74 | 74 | | agreements between the authority and firm water customers; |
---|
75 | 75 | | (6) any rules, policies, or similar guidance documents |
---|
76 | 76 | | of the authority; |
---|
77 | 77 | | (7) any rules, policies, or similar guidance documents |
---|
78 | 78 | | of the commission; |
---|
79 | 79 | | (8) the Water Code, this code, or any other law; or |
---|
80 | 80 | | (9) any other document. |
---|
81 | 81 | | SECTION 2. The Lower Colorado River Authority shall adopt |
---|
82 | 82 | | or amend its rules and its water management plan as required to |
---|
83 | 83 | | implement Sections 8503.032 and 8503.033, Special District Local |
---|
84 | 84 | | Laws Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
85 | 85 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
86 | 86 | | * * * * * |
---|