Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1631 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Fraser, Watson S.B. No. 1631
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2013; March 20, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 15, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 3; April 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to water management planning by the Lower Colorado River
 Authority.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 8503, Special District Local Laws Code,
 is amended by adding Sections 8503.032 and 8503.033 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 8503.032.  WATER MANAGEMENT PLAN. (a)  In this section
 and Section 8503.033:
 (1)  "Firm water" means a supply of water for customers
 of the authority that must be supplied 100 percent of the time
 without shortage through a repeat of the drought of record.
 (2)  "Interruptible water" means a supply of water for
 customers of the authority that does not have to be met 100 percent
 of the time and must be interrupted or curtailed as provided by
 Subsections (b) and (c).
 (b)  The authority shall interrupt or curtail the supply of
 water under the authority's certificates of adjudication 14-5478
 and 14-5482, as amended, pursuant to commitments that are
 specifically subject to interruption or curtailment, to the extent
 necessary to allow the authority to satisfy all demands for water
 under such permits pursuant to all firm, uninterruptible
 commitments.
 (c)  Supply of interruptible water must be cut off entirely
 before the authority curtails supplies of firm water or requests
 that firm water customers institute voluntary drought contingency
 measures.
 (d)  The authority's water management plan must:
 (1)  ensure that firm water supplies are available to
 meet all existing and projected demands of firm water customers to
 the extent provided by:
 (A)  the April 20, 1988, Final Judgment and Decree
 adjudicating water rights in the Lower Colorado River Basin ("1988
 Final Judgment and Decree");
 (B)  any orders issued by the commission or
 predecessor agencies subsequent to the 1988 Final Judgment and
 Decree approving the authority's water management plan for the
 operation of Lakes Travis and Buchanan;
 (C)  water rights adjudicated by the 1988 Final
 Judgment and Decree, and issued by the commission, as amended; and
 (D)  the provisions of the Water Code, rules of
 the commission, or other law; and
 (2)  cease all water releases of interruptible water
 when the combined storage of Lakes Travis and Buchanan is at or
 below 850,000 acre-feet.
 Sec. 8503.033.  FIRM WATER PROTECTION. Section 8503.032
 does not, and the legislature does not intend to, diminish,
 decrease, limit, impair, or modify, in any manner that is
 detrimental to firm water customers, the authority's commitments or
 contractual obligations to firm water customers or firm water
 customers' rights, entitlements, protections, prioritization, or
 status as either are set forth in:
 (1)  the April 20, 1988, Final Judgment and Decree
 adjudicating water rights in the Lower Colorado River Basin ("1988
 Final Judgment and Decree");
 (2)  any orders issued by the commission or predecessor
 agencies subsequent to the 1988 Final Judgment and Decree approving
 the authority's water management plan for operation of Lakes Travis
 and Buchanan;
 (3)  any water management plan of the authority
 approved by the commission;
 (4)  any permits or certificates of adjudication or
 amendments of these issued by the commission subsequent to the 1988
 Final Judgment and Decree;
 (5)  any existing water supply agreements or other
 agreements between the authority and firm water customers;
 (6)  any rules, policies, or similar guidance documents
 of the authority;
 (7)  any rules, policies, or similar guidance documents
 of the commission;
 (8)  the Water Code, this code, or any other law; or
 (9)  any other document.
 SECTION 2.  The Lower Colorado River Authority shall adopt
 or amend its rules and its water management plan as required to
 implement Sections 8503.032 and 8503.033, Special District Local
 Laws Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *