Senate | 03/25/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 609 | |
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 334 | |
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 118 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 118 | |
Senate | 01/09/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/09/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |