Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB170 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: West, Hinojosa S.B. No. 170
 (In the Senate - Filed January 9, 2013; January 29, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; March 25, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 1;
 March 25, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 170 By:  Garcia


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to building code standards for new residential
 construction in the unincorporated area of a county.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 233.152, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 233.152.  APPLICABILITY. (a)  Except as provided by
 Subsection (b), this [This] subchapter applies only to new
 residential construction in a county that has adopted a resolution
 or order requiring the application of the provisions of this
 subchapter and that:
 (1)  is located within 50 miles of an international
 border; or
 (2)  has a population of more than 100.
 (b)  This subchapter does not apply to new residential
 construction if:
 (1)  the property on which the new residential
 construction is located is appraised for ad valorem tax purposes as
 land for agricultural use or open-space land under Subchapter C or
 D, Chapter 23, Tax Code;
 (2)  the new residential construction will not be
 located within 1,000 feet of a platted subdivision;
 (3)  the new residential construction is intended to be
 used as the primary residence of an individual who is the builder
 of, or acts as the general contractor for, the construction; and
 (4)  the new residential construction is:
 (A)  the first residential construction, as
 described by Section 233.151(a)(1), to be built on the property; or
 (B)  an addition to an existing single-family
 house or duplex, as described by Section 233.151(a)(2).
 SECTION 2.  Section 233.154, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (c-1) to
 read as follows:
 (c)  If required by the county, not later than the 10th day
 after the date of the final inspection under this section, the
 builder shall submit notice of the inspection stating whether or
 not the inspection showed compliance with the building code
 standards applicable to that phase of construction in a form
 required by the county to:
 (1)  the county employee, department, or agency
 designated by the commissioners court of the county to receive the
 information, subject to Subsection (c-1); and
 (2)  the person for whom the new residential
 construction is being built, if different from the builder.
 (c-1)  The commissioners court of a county may designate the
 county clerk to receive information as provided by Subsection
 (c)(1) only if the county clerk consents to the designation.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter F, Chapter 233, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 233.1545 to read as follows:
 Sec. 233.1545.  CERTIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE; CONNECTION OF
 UTILITIES. (a)  A county to which this subchapter applies shall
 require the issuance of a certificate of compliance as a
 precondition to obtaining utility services as provided by this
 section.
 (b)  Not later than the fifth business day after the date a
 notice of inspection described by Section 233.154(c) stating that
 the inspection showed compliance with building code standards
 described by Section 233.153 is received, the county shall issue
 the party submitting the notice a written certificate of
 compliance.
 (c)  An electric, gas, water, or sewer service utility may
 not permanently serve or connect new residential construction of a
 single-family house or duplex as described by Section 233.151(a)(1)
 with electricity, gas, water, sewer, or other utility service
 unless the utility receives a certificate issued by the county
 under Subsection (b).
 (d)  Subsection (c) does not prevent the temporary use or
 connection of utilities necessary to complete new residential
 construction, including temporary use or connection of utilities to
 pass an inspection under this subchapter.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 new residential construction that commences on or after the
 effective date of this Act, except that if the county requires
 notice under Subsection (b), Section 233.154, Local Government
 Code, this Act applies only to new residential construction for
 which notice was given on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *