Senate | 05/22/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1762 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1727 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 512 | |
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 512 | |
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |