E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/25/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3737
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4914
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3280
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2054
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3596
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#924
|
Journal Page: 3601
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3601
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3601
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3585
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3585
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3019
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 1980
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 1980
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1734
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1734
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1628
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 976
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 934
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 934
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 934
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 933
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 933
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 933
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Rodrguez
|
Journal Page: 933
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 933
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 933
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 933
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 799
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 595
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 595
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|