E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/25/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3737
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4914
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3280
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2047
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3597
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3596
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#924
|
Journal Page: 3597
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3597
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3597
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3572
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3572
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3242
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 2544
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2544
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2274
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1434
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1387
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1387
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1387
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1387
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1387
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1387
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1387
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1312
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 938
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Rereferred to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 938
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security
|
|
Journal Page: 118
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 118
|
Senate
|
01/09/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|