E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/26/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3835
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5381
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3068
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2809
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4205
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1085
|
Journal Page: 4205
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4205
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4205
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4052
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4052
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4052
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3242
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Referred to Corrections
|
|
Journal Page: 2546
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2546
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2162
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1408
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1368
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1368
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1368
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1368
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1368
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1368
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1368
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1312
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 601
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 601
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|