E | 05/25/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/25/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3737 | |
E | 05/14/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1810 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3240 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1800 | |
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1809 | |
Senate | 05/13/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1733 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Record vote | RV#761 | Journal Page: 3041 |
House | 05/10/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3041 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3041 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3035 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3035 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2408 | Journal Page: 3035 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3090 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 2547 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2547 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2075 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1332 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1287 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1287 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1287 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1286 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1286 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1286 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1286 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1256 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1171 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Referred to Open Government | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 970 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |