Senate | 05/06/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1312 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |