Senate | 05/13/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1258 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1072 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1006 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |