E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3868 | |
E | 05/25/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3737 | |
House | 05/25/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4914 | |
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3280 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2910 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2166 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3760 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Record vote | RV#961 | Journal Page: 3759 |
House | 05/20/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3759 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3759 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3759 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3619 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3619 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Amendment withdrawn | 1-Murphy | Journal Page: 3619 |
House | 05/17/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3619 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1775 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1453 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1453 | |
House | 03/19/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 840 | |
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 543 | |
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 496 | |
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 496 | |
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 496 | |
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 496 | |
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 496 | |
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 496 | |
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 496 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 397 | |
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 121 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 121 | |
Senate | 01/22/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/22/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |