Senate | 04/15/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 909 | |
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 752 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 541 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 122 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 122 | |
Senate | 01/23/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/23/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |